+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/26/2013)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/11/2013)
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2013)
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor