+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2015)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2015)
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/19/2015)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2015)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor