+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2017)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Labor
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2017)
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government