+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013)
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/02/2013)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance