+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 19, 2019 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019)
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2019)
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (06/11/2019)
- Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2019)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2019)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor