+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2017)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2017)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2017)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary