+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/03/2013)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/03/2013)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/22/2013)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor