+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing (06/11/2013)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Commerce
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2013)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance