+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub B in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub B
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/03/2013)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2013)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2013)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2013)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance