+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2015)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2015)
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2015)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary