+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing (06/10/2015)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/12/2015)
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2015)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2015)
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor