+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2013)
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2013)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Commerce
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2013)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Small Business