+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2019)
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Proposed Substitute
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019)
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor