+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/21/2013)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2013)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/01/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor