+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/08/2019)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance