+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/14/2013)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/23/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2013)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor