+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2015)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2015)
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance