+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2015)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/19/2015)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2015)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary