+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013)
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2013)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Labor