+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2013)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2013)
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2013)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/24/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2013)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013)
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.