+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015)
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (06/23/2015)
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2015)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Labor