+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 26, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 19, 2023 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 9, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2023)
On June 6, 2023 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 2, 2023 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023)
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023)
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor