+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2015)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/15/2015)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/07/2015)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary