+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2015)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2015)
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2015)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2015)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources