+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013)
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/26/2013)
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing (06/12/2013)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2013)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2013)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor