+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
On June 23, 2019 in the House:
- Proposed Substitute
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary