+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2015)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance