+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Commerce
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2019)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor