+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2013)
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing (06/11/2013)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2013)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2013)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.