+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing (06/12/2013)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2013)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2013)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations