+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013)
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for consideration (07/01/2013)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2013)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (05/02/2013)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary