+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee transferred to House Finance
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations