+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor