+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
- House passed Sub B in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2013)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub B
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2013)
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2013)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Labor
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/15/2013)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2013)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Labor