+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 10, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/24/2015)
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor