+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2019)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.