+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/28/2013)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2013)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/02/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/26/2013)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor