+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013)
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2013)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2013)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2013)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary