+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2013)
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor