+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019)
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019)
- Proposed Substitute
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary