+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/25/2015)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (03/11/2015)
- Committee recommends passage
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor