+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013)
- Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/03/2013)
- Referred to Senate Commerce
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- House passed as amended (floor amendment)
- Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for consideration (07/02/2013)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations