+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2013)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (05/14/2013)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2013)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (04/25/2013)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (04/04/2013)
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2013)
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government