+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
- Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017)
- Senate voted to reconsider
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary