+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019)
On June 22, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations