+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2017)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.