+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2017)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2017)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2017)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor