+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Commerce
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations