+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2013)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2013)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance