+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2015)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2015)
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2015)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2015)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor